Logan v. Bank of America N.A.
Plaintiff: Jeannette Logan
Defendant: Bank of America N.A. and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Case Number: 1:2019cv11483
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 20 Opposition re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading to File Response/Reply as to #4 Amended Complaint filed by Jeannette Logan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Email Correspondence)(Ruggiero, Daniel)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Demerle on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Demerle, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading to File Response/Reply as to #4 Amended Complaint by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(Precobb, John) (Modified on 9/5/2019 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Precobb on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Precobb, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Chami. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Chami Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7848976 by Jeannette Logan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of David A. Chami, #2 Exhibit A- Court Admissions, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ruggiero, Daniel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeannette Logan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Ruggiero, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Ruggiero, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Ruggiero, Daniel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bank of America N.A. to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(McKillop, Matthew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America N.A.. (McCann, John) Modified on 8/5/2019. Memorandum and Exhibits docketed as own entry (See D. 11). (McKillop, Matthew).
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Ruggiero, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion to Withdraw Summons, D. 5 as wrong login was used by the law firm. (Hourihan, Lisa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Ruggiero, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw #5 Summons Returned Executed by Jeannette Logan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ruggiero, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bank of America N.A. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Chami, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America N.A., Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, filed by Jeannette Logan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request)(Ruggiero, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically shall download this summons, complete one for each defendant, and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America N.A. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7768245 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jeannette Logan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Summons Request)(Ruggiero, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Logan
Represented By: Daniel G. Ruggiero
Represented By: David A. Chami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: John H. McCann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Richard C. Demerle
Represented By: John T. Precobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?