ClimaCell, Inc. v. Messer-Yaron
Plaintiff: ClimaCell, Inc.
Defendant: Hagit Messer-Yaron
Case Number: 1:2019cv11487
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 53 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Loret, Magdalena)
November 27, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Hearing re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Counts II-V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by ClimaCell, Inc..(Kravitz, Jason)
November 27, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Hearing re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by ClimaCell, Inc..(Kravitz, Jason)
November 22, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Counts II-V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Samansky, Adam)
November 22, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Samansky, Adam)
November 18, 2019 Filing 48 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Counts II - V filed by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Kravitz, Jason)
November 18, 2019 Filing 47 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Kravitz, Jason)
November 18, 2019 Filing 46 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #44 Motion for Leave to File Reply Briefs in Support of Her Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Loret, Magdalena)
November 18, 2019 Filing 45 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Briefs in Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Loret, Magdalena)
November 15, 2019 Filing 44 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Briefs in Support of her Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Hagit Messer-Yaron.(Samansky, Adam)
November 8, 2019 Filing 43 Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Counts II-V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Kravitz, Jason)
November 8, 2019 Filing 42 Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Kravitz, Jason)
November 1, 2019 Filing 41 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Briefs In Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply re MTD Count I, #2 Exhibit Sur-Reply re MTD Counts II-V)(Kravitz, Jason)
November 1, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Withdraw #32 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Briefs In Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by ClimaCell, Inc..(Kravitz, Jason)
October 25, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Counts II-V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Samansky, Adam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Counts II-V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Hagit Messer-Yaron.(Samansky, Adam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Samansky, Adam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim in Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Hagit Messer-Yaron.(Samansky, Adam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION re #34 Reply to Response to Motion (Declaration of Mathilda S. McGee-Tubb) by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Samansky, Adam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Samansky, Adam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Counts II - V filed by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Samansky, Adam)
October 18, 2019 Filing 32 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Briefs In Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by ClimaCell, Inc..(Kravitz, Jason)
October 17, 2019 Filing 31 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time until 10/25/19 to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Leave to File Reply Briefs in Support of her Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint. (Loret, Magdalena)
October 16, 2019 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Leave to File Reply Briefs in Support of her Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Hagit Messer-Yaron.(Samansky, Adam)
October 8, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hagit Messer-Yaron, filed by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kravitz, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Angelo Christopher (in opposition to #21 Motion to Dismiss Counts II-V of the Complaint) by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Christopher, Angelo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Counts II - V filed by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Christopher, Angelo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Jason Kravitz (in Opposition to #18 Motion to Dismiss Count I of Complaint) by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kravitz, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Kravitz, Jason)
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Counts II - V (Hagit Messer-Yaron) by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Samansky, Adam)
September 20, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Counts II - V (Declaration of Adam P. Samansky) by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Samansky, Adam)
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Counts II - V filed by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Samansky, Adam)
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Counts II - V by Hagit Messer-Yaron.(Samansky, Adam)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Declaration of Adam P. Samansky) by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Samansky, Adam)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hagit Messer-Yaron. (Samansky, Adam)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Hagit Messer-Yaron.(Samansky, Adam)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathilda McGee-Tubb on behalf of Hagit Messer-Yaron (McGee-Tubb, Mathilda)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by J. Anthony Downs (Downs, J.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Anthony S. Fiotto (Fiotto, Anthony)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Angelo Christopher. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (Loret, Magdalena)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Angelo Christopher Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7853029 by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Angelo Christopher)(Kravitz, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Hagit Messer-Yaron served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Downs, J.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Kravitz on behalf of ClimaCell, Inc. (Kravitz, Jason)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 20, 2019 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Response to Complaint by Hagit Messer-Yaron.(Samansky, Adam)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam P. Samansky on behalf of Hagit Messer-Yaron (Samansky, Adam)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SetDeadlines: Complete Service by 10/7/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hagit Messer-Yaron. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S. Fiotto on behalf of ClimaCell, Inc. (Fiotto, Anthony)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Downs, J.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Anthony Downs on behalf of ClimaCell, Inc. (Downs, J.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hagit Messer-Yaron Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7768696 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ClimaCell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Local Category Form) (Downs, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ClimaCell, Inc. v. Messer-Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ClimaCell, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony S. Fiotto
Represented By: J. Anthony Downs
Represented By: Jason C. Kravitz
Represented By: Stephen M Larose
Represented By: Angelo Christopher
Represented By: Leslie E. Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hagit Messer-Yaron
Represented By: Adam P. Samansky
Represented By: Mathilda McGee-Tubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?