Mullane v. Portfolio Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mullane
Defendant: Portfolio Media, Inc. and Aaron Leibowitz
Case Number: 1:2019cv11496
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 41 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #40 Motion for Leave to Electronically file Pro Se. The court grants permission on the condition that the plaintiff satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. The plaintiff is directed to complete the registration form accessible at https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/ecfreg.html (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 29, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Jonathan Mullane.(Lara, Miguel)
August 27, 2019 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC NOTICE RESETTING HEARING on #15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court: Motion Hearing reset for 9/23/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 27, 2019 Filing 37 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #33 Defendant's Motion to Continue Hearing. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 27, 2019 Filing 36 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #31 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response due 14 days after the court's ruling on the motion to remand. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 26, 2019 Filing 39 Opposition re #33 MOTION to Continue Remand Hearing filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Lara, Miguel) (#1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Lara, Miguel).
August 26, 2019 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth A. McNamara in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Portfolio Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email chain between Plaintiff and counsel for Defendants)(Lecaroz, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 34 Opposition re #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Portfolio Media, Inc.. (Lecaroz, Rebecca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Continue Remand Hearing by Portfolio Media, Inc..(Lecaroz, Rebecca)
August 22, 2019 Filing 32 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #31 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to #27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Opposition, if any, shall be filed by close of business on 8/26/19. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jonathan Mullane.(Lara, Miguel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy of #29 Affidavit in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Counsel who filed this document is requested to submit a courtesy copy to Magistrate Judge Dein by 8/30/19. The document must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and the exhibits must be tabbed. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Portfolio Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's application for entry of default in Mullane v. Barclays Bank Delaware, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's motion and memorandum of law for an order to correct clerk's failure to make an entry of default in Barclays litigation, #3 Exhibit 3 - Court's order on Plaintiff's motion for default in the Barclays litigation, #4 Exhibit 4 - April 10. 2018 hearing transcript in Barclays litigation, #5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's recusal motion in Barclays litigation, #6 Exhibit 6 - Court's order granting Plaintiff's recusal motion in Barclays litigation, #7 Exhibit 7 - Court's decision in Blackstone-Chicago Corp. v. Brown, #8 Exhibit 8 - Court's Report and Recommendation on defendants' motion to dismiss in Mullane v. U.S.)(Lecaroz, Rebecca)
August 15, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Portfolio Media, Inc.. (Lecaroz, Rebecca)
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Portfolio Media, Inc..(Lecaroz, Rebecca)
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Ritvo on behalf of Aaron Leibowitz, Portfolio Media, Inc. (Ritvo, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Pacho, Arnold)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Second Amended Complaint. Defendant Leibowitz' response due 14 days after the court's ruling on the motion to remand. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 6, 2019 Filing 23 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Plaintiff should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Aaron Leibowitz.(Lecaroz, Rebecca)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to Submit a Reply by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Proposed reply)(Lara, Miguel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING on #15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court: Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #18 Opposition to Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - April 10, 2018 hearing transcript in Barclays Litigation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's April 13, 2018 recusal motion in Barclays Litigation, #3 Exhibit 3 - April 13, 2018 court order granting Plaintiff's recusal motion in Barclays Litigation, #4 Exhibit 4 - July 12, 2019 email from Plaintiff to counsel for Portfolio Media, Inc.)(Lecaroz, Rebecca)
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Portfolio Media, Inc.'s Memorandum of Reasons in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Portfolio Media, Inc.. (Lecaroz, Rebecca)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 STATE COURT Record. (Lara, Miguel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE by Jonathan Mullane as to Aaron Leibowitz (Lara, Miguel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand Due to Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lara, Miguel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 Copy re #13 Summons Issued, mailed to Jonathan Mullane on 7/18/19. (Lara, Miguel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Aaron Leibowitz. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR MANDATORY INJUNCTION against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lara, Miguel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 & #9 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Elizabeth A. McNamara & Adam Lazier added. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Defendant's Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to to 8/15/19 to Respond to Amended Complaint. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam Lazier Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7776721 by Portfolio Media, Inc..(Lecaroz, Rebecca)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth A. McNamara Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7776701 by Portfolio Media, Inc..(Lecaroz, Rebecca)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/15/2019 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Complaint by Portfolio Media, Inc..(Lecaroz, Rebecca)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Full Pretrial, R&R on Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Lara, Miguel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Warnock, Douglas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Portfolio Media, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RELX PLC for Portfolio Media, Inc... (Lecaroz, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, by Portfolio Media, Inc.. (Lecaroz, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Portfolio Media, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7771400 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Demand, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Verified Complaint in State Court Action, #3 Exhibit 3 - Verified Amended Complaint in State Court Action, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket in State Court Action, #5 Exhibit 5 - Civil Cover Sheet in State Court Action)(Lecaroz, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullane v. Portfolio Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mullane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Media, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca MacDowell Lecaroz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Ritvo
Represented By: Adam Lazier
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Leibowitz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Ritvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?