Power Products Sales and Service, Inc. v. Hydratight, Inc.
Plaintiff: Power Products Sales and Service, Inc.
Defendant: Hydratight, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11502
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin. filed by Power Products Sales and Service, Inc.. (Belanger, Allison)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin. filed by Power Products Sales and Service, Inc.. (Belanger, Allison)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Counsel should be prepared to argue all pending motions before the Court. (Lima, Christine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin. filed by Hydratight, Inc.. (Dennington, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin. filed by Hydratight, Inc.. (Dennington, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin. by Hydratight, Inc..(Dennington, Andrew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Hydratight, Inc..(Dennington, Andrew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record Hydratight, Inc. summons served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/31/2019.. (Muller, Julie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hydratight, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Actuant Corporation for Hydratight, Inc... (Muller, Julie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 31, 2019 to File Answer. Answer due 7/31/2019. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 31, 2019 to File Answer by Hydratight, Inc..(Muller, Julie)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie M. Muller on behalf of Hydratight, Inc. (Muller, Julie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Dennington on behalf of Hydratight, Inc. (Dennington, Andrew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hydratight, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7771760 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service (Tab A), #2 Exhibit Complaint (Tab B), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment (with Category Sheet))(Conn, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Products Sales and Service, Inc. v. Hydratight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Products Sales and Service, Inc.
Represented By: Allison A. Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydratight, Inc.
Represented By: Russell F. Conn
Represented By: Julie M. Muller
Represented By: Andrew R. Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?