Hughes v. Latini et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Hughes
Defendant: Dr. Jerilyn Latini and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv11505
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Catherine Hughes. United States of America served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Satin, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Satin on behalf of Catherine Hughes (Satin, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of Jerilyn Latini, United States of America (Brizius, Erin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jerilyn Latini, United States of America. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 19-cv-11505 against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7772497 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Catherine Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(Hu, Lynn) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Latini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jerilyn Latini
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Hughes
Represented By: Lynn I. Hu
Represented By: Adam R. Satin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?