Laye Diop v. Hodgson
Petitioner: Cheikh Ahmadou Bamba Laye Diop
Respondent: Thomas Hodgson
Case Number: 1:2019cv11509
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 Copy re #12 Order Dismissing Case, 11 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, mailed to Cheikh Ahmadou Bamba Laye Diop on 8/23/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Petitioner is in ICE custody pending the execution of a final order of removal and seeks release. Petitioner having averred that his removal order was issued on May 2, 2019, Dkt #1 at 1, the length of petitioner's detention for purpose of effectuating removal is less than six months, and presumptively reasonable under Zadvydas v. Davis, 533 U.S. 678 (2001). Accordingly, the petition will be DISMISSED and the Clerk shall close the case. SO ORDERED. (DT)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas Hodgson. (Johnson, Anita)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thomas Hodgson.(Johnson, Anita)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Thomas Hodgson (Johnson, Anita)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The clerk shall serve a copy of the petition upon the respondent and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. The respondent shall, within 21 days of the date of this order, respond to the petition.(PSSA, 4)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST075631 for #5 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. If petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. (Attachments: #1 IFP application form)(PSSA, 4)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Castilla, Francis)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Cheikh Ahmadou Bamba Laye Diop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laye Diop v. Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cheikh Ahmadou Bamba Laye Diop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Hodgson
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?