Green Valley Trading Company v. Olam Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Green Valley Trading Company
Defendant: Olam Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11524
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered denying #10 Motion to Remand. (FDS, law1)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand and Request for Sanctions filed by Olam Americas, Inc.. (Godkin, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition to Compel Arbitration by David S. Godkin on behalf of Olam Americas, Inc. by on behalf of Olam Americas, Inc.. Related document: #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Olam Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Godkin, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT re #11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Green Valley Trading Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Muggeo, Louis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand and Request for Sanctions filed by Green Valley Trading Company. (Muggeo, Louis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand and Request for Sanctions by Green Valley Trading Company.(Muggeo, Louis)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bono, Christine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 6, 2019 to submit opposition to Defendant Motion to Dismiss by Green Valley Trading Company.(Muggeo, Louis)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. (Godkin, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Olam Americas, Inc.. (Godkin, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition to Compel Arbitration by Olam Americas, Inc..(Godkin, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Kruzer on behalf of Olam Americas, Inc. (Kruzer, James)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. Case was randomly assigned due to 15cv14226-RWZ has been closed for 2 years. See Local Rule 40.1(g) (1). (Finn, Mary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Olam Americas, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7776474 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(Godkin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Valley Trading Company v. Olam Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olam Americas, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Godkin
Represented By: James E. Kruzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Valley Trading Company
Represented By: Louis J. Muggeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?