Hailu v. Flight Services & Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Seboka K. Hailu
Defendant: Flight Services & Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11527
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Conference is SCHEDULED for 10/3/2019 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flight Services & Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent International Total Services, Inc. for Flight Services & Systems, Inc... (Villano, Kenton)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Rosin on behalf of Flight Services & Systems, Inc. (Rosin, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Flight Services & Systems, Inc..(Villano, Kenton)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Flight Services & Systems, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7777006 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Seboka K. Hailu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form (Attles, Abeba) Modified on 7/12/2019 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/12/2019 to correct PDF formatting) (Kinsella, Devan). Modified party complaint against on 7/15/2019 (DaSilva, Carolina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hailu v. Flight Services & Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flight Services & Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kenton J. Villano
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seboka K. Hailu
Represented By: Abeba Attles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?