Ohio State Innovation Foundation v. Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ohio State Innovation Foundation
Defendant: Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11528
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Referring Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Natasha C. Pereira on behalf of Ohio State Innovation Foundation (Pereira, Natasha)
September 5, 2019 Filing 59 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Motion Hearing held on 9/5/2019 re #23 Motion to dismiss filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc. Order will issue. Parties will submit joint proposed schedule. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Centurelli, Day, Donnelly) (Folan, Karen)
August 1, 2019 Filing 58 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #23 : Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
July 30, 2019 Filing 57 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 30, 2019 Filing 56 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Centurelli, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 55 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #52 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James L. Day; granting #53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Winston Liaw. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Belmont, Kellyann)
July 30, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Christopher Donnelly on behalf of Akamai Technologies, Inc. (Donnelly, T.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 53 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Winston Liaw, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7805843 by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Winston Liaw, Esq.)(Ruby, Joshua)
July 30, 2019 Filing 52 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James L. Day, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7805825 by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James L. Day, Esq.)(Ruby, Joshua)
July 30, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua N. Ruby on behalf of Akamai Technologies, Inc. (Ruby, Joshua)
July 26, 2019 Filing 50 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher J. Fahy.; granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Patrick J. McElhinny;. granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added George C. Summerfield.; granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Erik J. Halverson.; granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anna Shabalov. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Belmont, Kellyann)
July 23, 2019 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Belmont, Kellyann)
July 23, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anna Shabalov Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7794829 by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Attorney Shabalov)(Centurelli, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erik J. Halverson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7794815 by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Attorney Halverson)(Centurelli, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of George C. Summerfield Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7794807 by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Attorney Summerfield)(Centurelli, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Patrick J. McElhinny Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7794783 by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Attorney McElhinny)(Centurelli, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher J. Fahy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7794759 by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Attorney Fahy)(Centurelli, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Centurelli on behalf of Ohio State Innovation Foundation (Centurelli, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
July 12, 2019 Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00484.
July 11, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the District of Massachusetts. (yguy)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, defendant's Motion to Transfer [Dkt. No. 26] is GRANTED, defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 23] is DEFERRED to the transferee court, and it is hereby ORDERED that this civil action be and is TRANSFERRED to the District of Massachusetts. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/11/19. (yguy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2019. Appearances of counsel. Motions argued. Deft #26 MOTION to Transfer Case is GRANTED. #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DEFERRED. (order to follow) (Court Reporter J. Egal.)(yguy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Eldridge on behalf of Ohio State Innovation Foundation (Eldridge, Amy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Molster, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Molster, Charles)
June 26, 2019 Filing 35 Opposition to #26 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Shabalov)(Rusnak, Eric)
June 26, 2019 Filing 34 Opposition to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rusnak, Eric)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDERED that the hearing on defendant's motions be RESCHEDULED to 7/11/2019 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/26/2019. (rban, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Pro hac vice of Winston Liaw. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/17/2019. (lcre, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Pro hac vice of James L. Day. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/17/2019. (lcre, )
June 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #26 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 30 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Winston Liaw and Certification of Local Counsel Charles B. Molster, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6687655. by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Molster, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 29 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James L. Day and Certification of Local Counsel Charles B. Molster, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6687644. by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Molster, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Hearing Date set for July 12 2019 re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case (Molster, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Affidavit)(Molster, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Transfer Case by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Molster, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Date set for July 12 2019 re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Molster, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Molster, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Molster, Charles)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice of Anna Shabalov. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/3/2019. (lcre, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice of Christopher James Fahy. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/3/2019. (lcre, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna Shabalov and Certification of Local Counsel Eric C. Rusnak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6668705. by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Rusnak, Eric)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher J. Fahy and Certification of Local Counsel Eric C. Rusnak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6668577. by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Rusnak, Eric)
April 30, 2019 Akamai Technologies, Inc. answer due 6/12/2019. (lcre, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for Akamai Technologies, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to June 12, 2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/30/2019. (lcre, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 17 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Akamai Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV on behalf of Akamai Technologies, Inc. (Carr, Dabney)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Erik James Halverson. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/24/2019. (lcre, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice of George Clark Summerfield. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/24/2019. (lcre, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice of Patrick Joseph McEllhinny. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/24/2019. (lcre, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ohio State Innovation Foundation Akamai Technologies, Inc. served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019 (Rusnak, Eric)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Erik J. Halverson and Certification of Local Counsel Eric C. Rusnak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6606176. by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Rusnak, Eric)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick J. McElhinny and Certification of Local Counsel Eric C. Rusnak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6606175. by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Rusnak, Eric)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by George C. Summerfield and Certification of Local Counsel Eric C. Rusnak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6606173. by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Rusnak, Eric)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Akamai Technologies, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(lcre, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. (lcre, )(c/s)
April 19, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lcre, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons (Corrected) by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Rusnak, Eric)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ohio State Innovation Foundation Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Rusnak, Eric)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Rusnak, Eric)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Rusnak, Eric)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6600289.), filed by Ohio State Innovation Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (U.S. Patent No. 9,531,522), #2 Exhibit B (Web Page), #3 Exhibit C (Agreement), #4 Exhibit D (Presentation), #5 Exhibit E (U.S. Pub. No. 2016/0191651), #6 Exhibit F (MAP SDK), #7 Exhibit G ('522 Chart), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rusnak, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio State Innovation Foundation v. Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio State Innovation Foundation
Represented By: Eric Christopher Rusnak
Represented By: Amy Jo Eldridge
Represented By: Erik J. Halverson
Represented By: Anna Shabalov
Represented By: Patrick J. McElhinny
Represented By: Christopher Centurelli
Represented By: George C. Summerfield
Represented By: Christopher James Fahy
Represented By: Natasha C. Pereira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: T. Christopher Donnelly
Represented By: James L. Day
Represented By: Winston Liaw
Represented By: Joshua N. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?