Cashman Equipment Corp. et al v. Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cashman Equipment Corp. and Servicio Marina Superior, LLC
Defendant: DW Fennessey Marine Services, LLC, Barbican Syndicate 1955, Chaucer Syndicate 1084, Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicate 1880, Laris Insurance Agency, LLC, Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC, Ranny Lee Fitch, Jr., Novae Syndicate 2007, Antares Syndicate 1274, Tokio Marine Combined Syndicate 510 and Korean Re Syndicate 6050
Case Number: 1:2019cv11532
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 27, 2019 to Respond to Complaint (Paine, Matthew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 27, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Laris Insurance Agency, LLC.(Conte, Daniel) (Modified on 9/9/2019 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC.(Byers, Michelle)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Byers on behalf of Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC (Byers, Michelle)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Flanagan on behalf of Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC (Flanagan, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 13, 2019 to Respond to Complaint; granting #11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 13, 2019 to Respond to Complaint. (Paine, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 13, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Antares Syndicate 1274, Barbican Syndicate 1955, Chaucer Syndicate 1084, Korean Re Syndicate 6050, Novae Syndicate 2007, Tokio Marine Combined Syndicate 510, Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicate 1880.(Byers, Matthew) Modified on 8/9/2019 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event(Paine, Matthew).
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Cashman Equipment Corp.. Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Cashman Equipment Corp.. (Rider, Stephen) Modified on 8/14/2019 to Correct Answer Date as Counsel Enterd the Wrong Date of Service.) (Paine, Matthew).
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 13, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Laris Insurance Agency, LLC.(Conte, Daniel) (Modified on 8/9/2019 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Conte on behalf of Laris Insurance Agency, LLC (Conte, Daniel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Grossbaum on behalf of Laris Insurance Agency, LLC (Grossbaum, David)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Cashman Equipment Corp.. DW Fennessey Marine Services, LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Cashman Equipment Corp.. (Rider, Stephen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Scott D. Brownell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott D. Brownell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7785707 by Cashman Equipment Corp., Servicio Marina Superior, LLC.(Rider, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2019: #1 Exhibit 1) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/18/2019) (Paine, Matthew).
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7778415 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cashman Equipment Corp., Servico Marina Superior, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet (Rider, Stephen) Modified on 7/12/2019 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashman Equipment Corp. et al v. Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DW Fennessey Marine Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbican Syndicate 1955
Represented By: Matthew B. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaucer Syndicate 1084
Represented By: Matthew B. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicate 1880
Represented By: Matthew B. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laris Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: David A. Grossbaum
Represented By: Daniel R. Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC
Represented By: Michelle M. Byers
Represented By: Christopher P. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranny Lee Fitch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novae Syndicate 2007
Represented By: Matthew B. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antares Syndicate 1274
Represented By: Matthew B. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine Combined Syndicate 510
Represented By: Matthew B. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korean Re Syndicate 6050
Represented By: Matthew B. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cashman Equipment Corp.
Represented By: Stephen W. Rider
Represented By: Scott D. Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Servicio Marina Superior, LLC
Represented By: Stephen W. Rider
Represented By: Scott D. Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?