Downey v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: Andrew Lelling, David Holway, William Barr, United States of America and Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv11536
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal Documents included: ECF No. 13 (Paine, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER re #10 Affidavit. Treated as a Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and allowed. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 19-1801 for #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Downey. (Paine, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Filed Under Seal)) (Pacho, Arnold)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Order Dismissing Case by Mark Downey. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter from COA Clerk's Office) (Pacho, Arnold)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering that the action be dismissed. (PSSA, 3)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Copy of Order 4 mailed to plaintiff on this date. (Kinsella, Devan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule Local Rule 40.1(g)(5), the Court hereby orders that this action be reassigned to Judge Richard G. Stearns as related to Downey v. United States, C.A. No. 19-11414-RGS. (Kinsella, Devan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Castilla, Francis)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 2 part of complaint, #3 3 part of complaint)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Holway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?