Ang v. Charles
Plaintiff: Try ANG
Defendant: Field Office Dir. Marcos Charles
Respondent: Marco D. Charles
Case Number: 1:2019cv11537
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2019 Filing 16 Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Try Ang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel)(Stylianos, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The 8/21/19 Status Conference is cancelled. (Russo, Noreen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Try Ang.. (Stylianos, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Marco D. Charles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sady, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Marco D. Charles.(Sady, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 SECOND ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not the plaintiff has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov / Resources / forms / local forms. NOTICE of Status Conference: Status Conference set for 8/21/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. If the plaintiff submits the consent or refusal form before the conference - the status shall be cancelled. (Russo, Noreen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 8/19/2019 (Russo, Noreen)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/19/19 to File Response/Reply by Marco D. Charles.(Sady, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT by USA ONLY to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Marco D. Charles.. (Sady, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Marco D. Charles (Sady, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. (PSSA, 5) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/15/2019) (PSSA, 5). Modified on 7/15/2019 to correct respondent name. (PSSA, 5).
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Try Ang. (Lara, Miguel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Lara, Miguel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7779129 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Try ANG. (Attachments: #1 Catagory Form, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A Application for Stay, #4 Exhibit B Release Revocation)(Stylianos, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ang v. Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Try ANG
Represented By: Thomas Stylianos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Dir. Marcos Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marco D. Charles
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?