Axford et al v. TGM Andover Park, LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy Axford, Senaa Axford and Yusuf M. Axford
Defendant: TGM Andover Park, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11540
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Ravosa, Jr on behalf of Senaa Axford, Timothy Axford, Yusuf M. Axford (Ravosa, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim by TGM Andover Park LLC by Senaa Axford, Timothy Axford, Yusuf M. Axford.(Sandau, Dara)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Trent D. Stephens. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Trent D. Stephens Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7794945 by TGM Andover Park, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stephens)(Gilleran, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by TGM Andover Park, LLC.(Gilleran, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Lara, Miguel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TGM Andover Park, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7779341 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Demand letter, #4 Exhibit Tracking order, #5 Exhibit Notice of conference, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilleran, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #7 Category Form) (Lara, Miguel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axford et al v. TGM Andover Park, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Axford
Represented By: Richard S. Ravosa, Jr.
Represented By: Dara J. Sandau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senaa Axford
Represented By: Richard S. Ravosa, Jr.
Represented By: Dara J. Sandau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yusuf M. Axford
Represented By: Richard S. Ravosa, Jr.
Represented By: Dara J. Sandau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGM Andover Park, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Gilleran
Represented By: Trent D. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?