CHHUN v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Kimsok CHHUN
Defendant: District Director Denis Riordan, Secretary Kevin McAleenan, Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli and Boston Field Off Dir Mike McCleary
Case Number: 1:2019cv11584
Filed: July 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference of 09/26/2019 to please the court (suggestions) by Kimsok CHHUN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Travel Reservations)(Stylianos, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Kimsok CHHUN. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mail Receipts and Documents)(Stylianos, Thomas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Mike McCleary, Denis Riordan (Johnson, Anita)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Pacho, Arnold)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7791005 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kimsok CHHUN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A Response of 02/08/2019)(Stylianos, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHHUN v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Denis Riordan
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Field Off Dir Mike McCleary
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimsok CHHUN
Represented By: Thomas Stylianos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?