Philips North America LLC v. Fitbit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11586
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Eley O. Thompson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eley O. Thompson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7823744 by Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Lucas Silva in Support of Motion For Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Eley Thompson in Support of Motion For Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit 1)(Silva, Lucas)
July 28, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philips North America LLC. (Silva, Lucas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fitbit, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Silva, Lucas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Fitbit, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7792833 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Category Form)(Silva, Lucas) (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/23/2019 to correct PDF formatting) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips North America LLC v. Fitbit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Lucas I. Silva
Represented By: Eley O Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?