Fopiano v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Penelope Fopiano
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv11599
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Penelope Fopiano. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Cafarelli, Ralph)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penelope Fopiano. (Cafarelli, Ralph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Brizius, Erin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Penelope Fopiano against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7796938 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Penelope Fopiano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Category 1 Form)(Cafarelli, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fopiano v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penelope Fopiano
Represented By: Ralph J. Cafarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?