Solta Medical, Inc. v. Lumenis, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Solta Medical, Inc.
Defendant: Lumenis, Ltd. and Lumenis, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11600
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants Lumenis, Inc. and Lumenis, Ltd. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint to be Extended to and Including November 5, 2019 by Solta Medical, Inc. APPROVED. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Extension of Time for Defendants Lumenis, Inc. and Lumenis, Ltd. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint to be Extended to and Including November 5, 2019 by Solta Medical, Inc.. (Clouse, Katherine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Solta Medical, Inc.. Lumenis, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Clouse, Katherine)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Solta Medical, Inc.. Lumenis, Inc. served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Solta Medical, Inc.. (Clouse, Katherine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Clouse, Katherine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: This is a reminder to counsel, please file the AO 120 Report of Filing a Patent Infringement Form. (Jones, Sherry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lumenis, Inc., Lumenis, Ltd.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Solta Medical, Inc.. (Clouse, Katherine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7796943 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Solta Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Clouse, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solta Medical, Inc. v. Lumenis, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solta Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Nicole Clouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumenis, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumenis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?