Prostairs Fitness, LLC et al v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Richard Mullen and Prostairs Fitness, LLC
Defendant: Colliseum, LLC and Collis Brown
Case Number: 1:2019cv11604
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Brown has until 9/27/19 to file a response to the complaint. Defendant Brown cannot represent the corporation, it must be represented by counsel. U.S.C. section 1654; See D.S. Atkinson, Inc. v. Lutin Cent. Services Co., Inc., 45 F3d (423) (1st Cir. 1995) (table) (citing Eagle Assoc. v. Bank of Montreal, 926 F2d 1305, 1308 (2d Cir. 1991)) (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #11 Opposition to Motion by Richard Mullen. (McGowan, Owen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 First Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Richard Mullen. (McGowan, Owen)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Collis Brown.(McKillop, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Colliseum, LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (McGowan, Owen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Collis Brown served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (McGowan, Owen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gregory Kennt Nelson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gregory Kennt Nelson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7821150 by Richard Mullen, Prostairs Fitness, LLC.(Greeley, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Greeley on behalf of Richard Mullen, Prostairs Fitness, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance of Owen P. McGowan, #2 Notice of Appearance of Jacob E. Lavin)(Greeley, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 PATENT 9,114,271)(Greeley, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7797716 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Prostairs Fitness, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Greeley, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prostairs Fitness, LLC et al v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colliseum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mullen
Represented By: Christopher J. Greeley
Represented By: Gregory Kennt Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prostairs Fitness, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Greeley
Represented By: Gregory Kennt Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?