Davenport v. Eastern Recovery, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Christian Davenport
Defendant: Eastern Recovery, Inc. and Challenge Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11609
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered granting #5 Motion to Amend Complaint. (Loret, Magdalena)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Christian Davenport. (Attachments: #1 with exhibits)(Korth, Sebastian)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 10/24/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically shall download this summons, complete one for each defendant, and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7800351 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Christian Davenport. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Form) (Korth, Sebastian) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/26/2019 to separate exhibit) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #3 Exhibit A) (DeMaria, Timothy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davenport v. Eastern Recovery, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Challenge Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Davenport
Represented By: Sebastian N. Korth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?