Caldwell v. BET Information Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: April Caldwell
Defendant: BET Information Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11625
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/27/19 to respond to complaint. (Folan, Karen)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 27, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Respond To Complaint by BET Information Systems, Inc..(Crowley, Emily)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Marino on behalf of BET Information Systems, Inc. (Marino, Christopher)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/19/19 to respond to complaint. (Folan, Karen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 19, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Respond To Complaint by BET Information Systems, Inc..(Crowley, Emily)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily P. Crowley on behalf of BET Information Systems, Inc. (Crowley, Emily)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Avi R. Kaufman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Avi R. Kaufman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7843650 by April Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Campbell, Jason)
August 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. (Campbell, Jason)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by April Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Category Form)(Campbell, Jason)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BET Information Systems, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7803553 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by April Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Campbell, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. BET Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Caldwell
Represented By: Jason R. Campbell
Represented By: Avi R. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BET Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Emily P. Crowley
Represented By: Christopher J. Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?