Tiefenthaler v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hans Tiefenthaler
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11632
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 18, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Paine, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Zachary S. Foster. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Zachary S. Foster Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7872231 by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted))(Callanan, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 18, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Callanan, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A Callanan on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Callanan, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Progressive Direct Insurance Company served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Paronich, Anthony)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Hans Tiefenthaler. ** (Document resubmitted due to missing signature by attorney) (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Progressive Direct Insurance Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7805332 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Hans Tiefenthaler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Category Form)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiefenthaler v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Tiefenthaler
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher A Callanan
Represented By: Zachary S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?