Toomey et al v. DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Toomey, Randall May and Nanette Langone
Defendant: DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden and William J. Shea
Case Number: 1:2019cv11633
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 85 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT entered. A Settlement Conference has been set for 4/7/2021 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin re #83 Proposed Document(s) submitted filed by Paul Toomey, Nanette Langone, Randall May, #77 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) filed by Paul Toomey, Nanette Langone, Randall May, ( Settlement Conference set for 4/7/2021 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.)(Simeone, Maria) (Main Document 85 replaced on 12/15/2020) (Simeone, Maria).
November 24, 2020 Filing 84 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #77 Motion Preliminary approval of Class Action Settlement. (Simeone, Maria)
November 20, 2020 Filing 83 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Nanette Langone, Randall May, Paul Toomey. Document received: Proposed Order. (Richter, Kai)
November 20, 2020 Filing 82 DECLARATION re #77 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) of Nanette Langone by Nanette Langone, Randall May, Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Richter, Kai)
November 20, 2020 Filing 81 DECLARATION re #77 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) of Randall May by Nanette Langone, Randall May, Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Richter, Kai)
November 20, 2020 Filing 80 DECLARATION re #77 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) of Paul Toomey by Nanette Langone, Randall May, Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Richter, Kai)
November 20, 2020 Filing 79 DECLARATION re #77 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) of Kai Richter by Nanette Langone, Randall May, Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Richter, Kai)
November 20, 2020 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM in Support re #77 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) filed by Nanette Langone, Randall May, Paul Toomey. (Richter, Kai)
November 20, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) by Nanette Langone, Randall May, Paul Toomey.(Richter, Kai)
November 12, 2020 Filing 76 Set Deadlines: Complete settlement by 11/20/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
November 12, 2020 Filing 75 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered.The #74 The joint request to extend the deadline to November 20, 2020 to complete the settlement is ALLOWED. re #74 Status Report filed by William F. Marsden, William J. Shea, DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas (Montes, Mariliz)
November 11, 2020 Filing 74 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea. (Routh, Jennifer)
October 13, 2020 Filing 73 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Status Conference held on 10/13/2020. Counsel report they have settled the case and request a stay of the deadlines. In light of the settlement filed by the parties, the schedule is stayed per order of the court unless a motion for approval of the settlement is filed. ( Status Report due by 11/13/2020). (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
October 13, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Settlement by Nanette Langone, Randall May, Paul Toomey (Richter, Kai)
October 8, 2020 Filing 71 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #70 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint.Answer or responding pleading due by 10/14/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 7, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 14, 2020 to Respond to Amended Complaint by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea.(Walters, Sarah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 69 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.The status conference set for 10/7/20 at 2:15 has been rescheduled to 10/13/20 at 11:00AM before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Status Conference reset for 10/13/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
October 5, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Kai H. Richter (Richter, Kai)
September 24, 2020 Filing 67 AMENDED COMPLAINT against William F. Marsden, Arthur T. Demoulas, DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., William J. Shea, filed by Paul Toomey, Nanette Langone, Randall May.(Richter, Kai)
September 24, 2020 Filing 66 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered allowing #65 Joint Stipulation Regarding Amended Complaint. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 23, 2020 Filing 65 STIPULATION Regarding Amended Complaint (Joint) by Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Richter, Kai)
September 14, 2020 Filing 64 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties' request in the #63 Letter/request (non-motion) filed is ALLOWED. The Status Conference currently scheduled for 9/30/2020, is reset for 10/7/2020 at 02:15 PM before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.(Montes, Mariliz)
September 11, 2020 Filing 63 Letter/request (non-motion) from Kai Richter regarding status conference.. (Richter, Kai)
September 10, 2020 Filing 62 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULINGThe Status Conference set for 9/16/20 has been reset for 9/30/2020 03:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Status Conference set for 9/30/2020 03:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
August 31, 2020 Filing 61 Withdrawal of motion: #53 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and ESI filed by Paul Toomey.. (Richter, Kai)
August 26, 2020 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to #53 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and ESI filed by Paul Toomey. (Richter, Kai)
August 26, 2020 Filing 59 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #58 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery and Documents. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
August 26, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery and Documents by Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Richter, Kai)
August 21, 2020 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Jennifer B. Routh in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea. (Routh, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 56 Opposition re #53 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and ESI filed by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea. (Routh, Jennifer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 55 DECLARATION re #53 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and ESI of Kai Richter by Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Richter, Kai)
August 7, 2020 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Support re #53 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and ESI filed by Paul Toomey. (Richter, Kai)
August 7, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and ESI by Paul Toomey.(Richter, Kai)
May 28, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 28, 2020 Filing 51 Transcript of Video Conference Motion Hearing held on April 8, 2020, before Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com Redaction Request due 6/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 13, 2020 Filing 50 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ENDORSED ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER(Montes, Mariliz)
May 13, 2020 Filing 49 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #48 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 12, 2020 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walters, Sarah)
May 7, 2020 Filing 47 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER:Amended pleadings due by 9/30/2020; fact discovery to be completed by 3/15/2021; dispositive motions due by 7/31/2021. A Status Conference is set for 9/16/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Another Status Conference is set for 3/17/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.(Montes, Mariliz)
May 7, 2020 Filing 46 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #45 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference.The Court ADOPTS the schedule proposed by the parties as the governing schedule in this case. At the request of the parties, the Court CANCELS the Rule 16 conference currently scheduled for 5/13/2020. The Court schedules a status conference for September 16, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Counsel may attend by telephone or, if authorized by the Court at that time, zoom.(Montes, Mariliz)
May 6, 2020 Filing 45 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Richter, Kai)
April 30, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea.(Walters, Sarah)
April 22, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 5/13/2020 01:45 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. A link will be provided to appear via video/telephone prior to the hearing. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
April 16, 2020 Filing 42 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 32) entered.For the reasons stated, the Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I of the complaint. Because Count II is, for purposes of the motion to dismiss, derivative of Count I, the motion is also DENIED as to Count II. The Clerk shall schedule a Rule 16 conference. #32 Motion to Dismiss (Simeone, Maria)
April 8, 2020 Filing 41 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Motion Hearing held via Video Conference on 4/8/2020.The court hears the oral argument of counsel on the #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William F. Marsden, William J. Shea, DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas and takes the matter under advisement. re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William F. Marsden, William J. Shea, DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
March 11, 2020 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion: A Motion Hearing on #32 MOTION to Dismiss is set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Montes, Mariliz)
November 4, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea. (Walters, Sarah)
October 30, 2019 Filing 38 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
October 29, 2019 Filing 37 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea.(Walters, Sarah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paul Toomey. (Richter, Kai)
October 1, 2019 Filing 35 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #34 assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 10/28/2019 (Simeone, Maria)
October 1, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/28/2019 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Paul Toomey.(Richter, Kai)
September 27, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Walters, Sarah)
September 27, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea.(Walters, Sarah)
September 27, 2019 Filing 31 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #30 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew A. Waring. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 27, 2019 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew A. Waring Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7897518 by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea.(Walters, Sarah) (Main Document 30 replaced on 9/27/2019) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #1 Exhibit 1) (Montes, Mariliz). Modified on 9/27/2019 to replace documents with motion and exhibit filed as an attachment (Montes, Mariliz).
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/27/2019 to File Answer/ Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint. Defendants, DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden and William J. Shea answer/responsive pleading due by 9/27/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 6, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/27/2019 to File Answer/ Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea.(Walters, Sarah) Modified on 9/6/2019 to correct description of pleading (Montes, Mariliz).
August 23, 2019 Filing 27 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Benjamin J. Bauer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 26 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brock J. Specht. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brandon T. McDonough. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Carl F. Engstrom. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kai H. Richter. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul J. Lukas. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Benjamin J. Bauer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7844603 by Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leviton, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brock J. Specht Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7844588 by Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leviton, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brandon T. McDonough Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7844581 by Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leviton, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Carl F. Engstrom Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7844552 by Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leviton, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kai H. Richter Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7844530 by Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leviton, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul J. Lukas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7844511 by Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leviton, Jason)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jennifer B. Routh. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 assented to Motion for Extension of Time to answer to 9/20/19. (Simeone, Maria)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Margaret H. Warner. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/20/2019 to Answer Complaint by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea.(Walters, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jennifer B. Routh Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7838168 by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Walters, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Margaret H. Warner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7838017 by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Walters, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Walters on behalf of DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Arthur T. Demoulas, William F. Marsden, William J. Shea (Walters, Sarah)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Arthur T. Demoulas served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Leviton, Jason)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed William F. Marsden served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Leviton, Jason)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed William J. Shea served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Leviton, Jason)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc. served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Leviton, Jason)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 10/28/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William F. Marsden, Arthur T. Demoulas, DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., William J. Shea Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7806129 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by DeMoulas (Restated) Profit Sharing Plan and Trust, Paul Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Leviton, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toomey et al v. DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret H. Warner
Represented By: Matthew A. Waring
Represented By: Sarah E. Walters
Represented By: Jennifer B Routh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur T. Demoulas
Represented By: Margaret H. Warner
Represented By: Matthew A. Waring
Represented By: Sarah E. Walters
Represented By: Jennifer B Routh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Marsden
Represented By: Margaret H. Warner
Represented By: Matthew A. Waring
Represented By: Sarah E. Walters
Represented By: Jennifer B Routh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Shea
Represented By: Margaret H. Warner
Represented By: Matthew A. Waring
Represented By: Sarah E. Walters
Represented By: Jennifer B Routh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Toomey
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Brandon T. McDonough
Represented By: Kai H. Richter
Represented By: Carl F. Engstrom
Represented By: Benjamin J. Bauer
Represented By: Brock J. Specht
Represented By: Paul J. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall May
Represented By: Kai H. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanette Langone
Represented By: Kai H. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?