Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Davester LLC et al
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Town Taxi of Cape Cod, Inc., Hudson Aguiar, Davester LLC, Newman Galati and Hospitality Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11634
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Stay this Action filed by Hospitality Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Pursuant to the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Section (G) Number (4): Any memorandum of law or other attachment filed in support of a main document shall be filed as a separate document, using the proper event.(DaSilva, Carolina)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay this Action by Hospitality Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Filed as a separate entry, using the proper event. See #20 )(Brosnan, John) (DaSilva, Carolina).
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Perkins, Matthew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Newman Galati.(Manoog, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/19 is RESET for 9/26/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 9/24/2019, to correct Courtroom number. Proceedings will be held in Courtroom 9. (MacDonald, Gail).
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #14 Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to 9/24/2019 (afternoon) or 9/26/2019 by Matthew W. Perkins on behalf of Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to 9/24/2019 (afternoon) or 9/26/2019 by Atain Specialty Insurance Company.(Perkins, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Davester LLC.(Bianchi, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hospitality Mutual Insurance Company.(Brosnan, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Town Taxi of Cape Cod, Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Perkins, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Newman Galati served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Perkins, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Hudson Aguiar served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Perkins, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Davester LLC served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Perkins, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Hospitality Mutual Insurance Company served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Perkins, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Perkins, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7806489 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Insurance Policy)(Perkins, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Davester LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew W. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Taxi of Cape Cod, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davester LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Bianchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newman Galati
Represented By: John Charles Manoog, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John F. Brosnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?