Hyatt v. Aramark Corporation
Plaintiff: Francis J Hyatt
Defendant: Aramark Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv11688
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Aramark Corporation.(Brosnihan, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling 9/24/2019 Scheduling Conference. New date will be assigned. (Putnam, Harold)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aramark Corporation.(Brosnihan, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aramark Corporation. (Brosnihan, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aramark Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7818443 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Brosnihan, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #3 Exhibit) (Coppola, Katelyn). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/6/2019) Modified in order to separate the exhibit from the complaint (Coppola, Katelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyatt v. Aramark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Corporation
Represented By: David A. Brosnihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis J Hyatt
Represented By: Armand M. Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?