Bose Corporation v. Goldstein
Plaintiff: Bose Corporation
Defendant: Andre Goldstein
Case Number: 1:2019cv11707
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey S. Follett in Opposition re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Andre Goldstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent, #2 Exhibit Patent, #3 Exhibit Patent, #4 Exhibit Patent, #5 Exhibit Patent, #6 Exhibit Patent, #7 Exhibit Patent, #8 Exhibit Patent, #9 Exhibit Patent, #10 Exhibit Article, #11 Exhibit Article, #12 Exhibit Curriculum Vitae, #13 Exhibit Stroz Friedberg Website Material, #14 Exhibit Stroz Friedberg Website Material)(Follett, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Filing 44 Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Andre Goldstein. (Follett, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Filing 43 Opposition re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Andre Goldstein. (Follett, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 27, 2019 Filing 41 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on August 13, 2019, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 10/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 25, 2019 Filing 40 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #35 Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
September 24, 2019 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction Declaration of Kenton W. Freeman, Jr. in Support of Bose Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Freeman, Kenton) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/26/2019) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/26/2019) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 5 replaced on 9/26/2019) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/26/2019) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 7 replaced on 9/26/2019) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 8 replaced on 9/26/2019) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 9 replaced on 9/26/2019) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 11 replaced on 9/26/2019) (McDonagh, Christina).
September 24, 2019 Filing 38 STATEMENT of Material facts re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction . (Freeman, Kenton) Modified on 9/26/2019 to change docket text(McDonagh, Christina).
September 24, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Bose Corporation. (Freeman, Kenton)
September 24, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Bose Corporation.(Freeman, Kenton)
September 24, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal Unopposed by Bose Corporation.(Freeman, Kenton)
September 19, 2019 Filing 34 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Preliminary Injunction entered by the Court on August 15, 2019 [ECF No. #23 ] and extended on September 9, 2019 [ECF No. 30 ] shall remain in effect through October 8, 2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 18, 2019 Filing 33 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Juanita Brooks. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 18, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Telephone Conference reset for 9/19/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Parties can call in to 888-363-4734, access code 6426345(Folan, Karen)
September 18, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Juanita Brooks Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7882536 by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freeman, Kenton)
September 9, 2019 Filing 30 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on September 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff Bose shall file its motion for permanent injunction and final judgment on September 24, 2019. Defendant Goldstein shall respond to Plaintiff Bose's motion on October 1, 2019. A hearing on Plaintiff's Bose's motion will be held on October 8, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The Preliminary Injunction entered by the Court [ECF No. #23 ] shall remain in effect until September 20, 2019.(McDonagh, Christina)
September 6, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Order to Scheduling by Bose Corporation.(Freeman, Kenton)
September 5, 2019 Filing 28 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Limin Zheng. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 5, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Limin Zheng Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7862873 by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freeman, Kenton)
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER entered(McDonagh, Christina)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Bose Corporation. Document received: Joint Submission of [Proposed] Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Protective Order)(Freeman, Kenton)
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andre Goldstein served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Freeman, Kenton)
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION order. This order will remain in effect for a period of 30 days.(Folan, Karen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction.(Folan, Karen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Bose Corporation. Document received: Joint Submission of [Proposed] Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Dillon, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Motion Hearing held on 8/13/2019 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Bose Corporation. Order will issue. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Kopsidas, Follett) (Folan, Karen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Bose Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Andre Goldstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence)(Follett, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Bose Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Notice is for Clerical Purposes Only.(McDonagh, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2019 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Bose Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Bose Corporation. The Court continues the matter until Tuesday, August 13, 2019 at 10:30 AM and notifies counsel for the defendant that his client must appear at the hearing. If an evidentiary hearing is necessary counsel should be prepared with witnesses to proceed on Tuesday, August 13, 2019. Counsel shall submit a proposed order for the Court's review. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorney Kopsidas for the plaintiff and Attorney Follett) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Bose Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Bose Corporation. Document received: Joint Submission of Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dillon, Christopher)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Andrew R. Kopsidas. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Follett on behalf of Andre Goldstein (Follett, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew R. Kopsidas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7823078 by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Andrew R. Kopsidas)(Dillon, Christopher)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Bose Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Plaintiff Bose Corporation shall notify counsel for Defendant Andre Goldstein of the hearing. NOTICE IS FOR TIME CHANGE ONLY.(Folan, Karen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Bose Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Plaintiff Bose Corporation shall notify counsel for Defendant Andre Goldstein of the hearing.(Folan, Karen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Bose Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Bose Corporation.(Dillon, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenton W. Freeman on behalf of Bose Corporation (Freeman, Kenton)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bose Corporation. (Dillon, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andre Goldstein Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7821616 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Dillon, Christopher) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/8/2019) (McDonagh, Christina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bose Corporation v. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bose Corporation
Represented By: Christopher R. Dillon
Represented By: Kenton W. Freeman
Represented By: Andrew R. Kopsidas
Represented By: Juanita R. Brooks
Represented By: Limin Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Follett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?