Krishnan v. Blueprint Healthcare LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sanjay Krishnan
Defendant: Blueprint Healthcare LLC, Alindele Majekodunmi and Akindele Majekodunmi
Case Number: 1:2019cv11708
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Continue to 11/02/19 by Blueprint Healthcare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dennehy, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Continue 10/04/19 to 09/30/19 by Blueprint Healthcare LLC.(Dennehy, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Dennehy, John)
August 18, 2019 Filing 8 Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim by Sanjay Krishnan.(Moeslinger, Raven)
August 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Sanjay Krishnan.(Moeslinger, Raven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Blueprint Healthcare LLC.(Dennehy, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7821650 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Blueprint Healthcare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 JS45)(Dennehy, John) Modified on 8/8/2019 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krishnan v. Blueprint Healthcare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blueprint Healthcare LLC
Represented By: John W. Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alindele Majekodunmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akindele Majekodunmi
Represented By: John W. Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanjay Krishnan
Represented By: Raven Moeslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?