PennyMac Holdings LLC v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: PennyMac Holdings LLC
Defendant: Seamen's Bank, Donna R Zoppi, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Warren E. Agin and Carlos A Vicente
Case Number: 1:2019cv11723
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Joint Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference reset for 11/5/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling conference by Warren E. Agin, Seamen's Bank, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Fanger, Alan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 10/9/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Assented to Motion to Continue Hearing. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan S. Fanger on behalf of Warren E. Agin (Fanger, Alan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to October 3, 2019 by PennyMac Holdings LLC.(Billeri, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PennyMac Holdings LLC (Billeri, Sarah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Rubenstein, Arie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form, #3 Exhibit Process and other materials)(Rubenstein, Arie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PennyMac Holdings LLC v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PennyMac Holdings LLC
Represented By: Sarah A. Billeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seamen's Bank
Represented By: Alan S. Fanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna R Zoppi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Arie M. Rubenstein
Represented By: Alan S. Fanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren E. Agin
Represented By: Alan S. Fanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos A Vicente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?