Javakhishvili v. Moniz
Petitioner: Ludwig Javakhishvili
Respondent: Todd Lyons, Sheriff Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., William P. Barr, Kevin McAleenan and Superintendant Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2019cv11739
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Poswistilo, Susan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Antone Moniz 48-Hour Notice of Intent to Remove (Poswistilo, Susan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Poswistilo, Susan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Antone Moniz.(Poswistilo, Susan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Poswistilo on behalf of Antone Moniz (Poswistilo, Susan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. PCCF Superintendent Antone Moniz shall be substituted as the sole respondent. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition upon (i) PCCF Superintendent Antone Moniz; and (ii) the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Respondent shall, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order (September 27, 2019), file a motion to grant or deny the Petition and a legal memorandum in support thereof. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. (PSSA, 3)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST075873 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Currie, Haley)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. If petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order (September 3, 2019), he either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. (PSSA, 3)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (DeMaria, Timothy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Ludwig Javakhishvili. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (DeMaria, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Javakhishvili v. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendant Antone Moniz
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ludwig Javakhishvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?