Barnes v. Spaulding
Petitioner: Eric Derell Barnes
Respondent: Warden Spaulding
Case Number: 1:2019cv11745
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Copy re 8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer mailed to Eric Derell Barnes on 10/9/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to November 7, 2019 to File Answer to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/7/19 to File Response/Reply by Spaulding.(Sady, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Spaulding (Sady, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: SERVICE ORDER entered. re 2241 Petition. 1.The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition upon (i) FMC Devens Warden Stephen Spaulding; and (ii) the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 2.Respondent shall, within twenty-one days of receipt of this order, file a response to the petition. (PSSA, 4)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST075992 for #3 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Richard G. Stearns: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. if petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. (Attachments: #1 IFP application form)(PSSA, 4)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by Eric Derell Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Spaulding
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Derell Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?