Loiacono v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Loiacono
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc., WorkforceQA LLC and JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv11758
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kimberly Loiacono (Stafford, Eric)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric N. Stafford on behalf of Kimberly Loiacono (Stafford, Eric)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sahar M. Basaria on behalf of Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. (Basaria, Sahar)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Added D. Faye Caldwell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Chambers, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Chambers, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Chambers, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LabOne LLC for Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc... (Gilman, Pamela)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.. (Gilman, Pamela)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc..(Gilman, Pamela)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of D. Faye Caldwell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7845146 by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of D. Faye Caldwell)(Gilman, Pamela)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Chambers on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Chambers, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Warnock, Douglas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JetBlue Airways Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7834041 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Quest Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Workforce Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Sheet)(Winton, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loiacono v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: D. Faye Caldwell
Represented By: Pamela S. Gilman
Represented By: Sahar M. Basaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WorkforceQA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Erik J. Winton
Represented By: Matthew C. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Loiacono
Represented By: Jennifer M Foster
Represented By: Roberto L. DiMarco
Represented By: Eric N. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?