Driessen et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Driessen and Laura Driessen
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11783
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 10/15/2019. 1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings. 2) The Court heard updates on Phase 5 discovery. 3) The Court scheduled argument on GSK's motion to compel Dr. Zambelli-Weiner to produce documents and leave for second deposition (Docket Nos. 1662, 1665) for October 25, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. 4) The Court set further deadlines for briefing on GSK's renewed motion for summary judgment based on federal preemption. Plaintiffs' opposition remains due by October 18, 2019. Defendant's reply is due by October 29, 2019. The motion will be argued on either November 4, 5, or 6, 2019, depending on the parties' availability. A further order setting the date will issue. 5) The Court heard the parties' proposals for a pretrial schedule in in Rodriguez v. GSK, Case No. 1:15-cv-13762. The Court set a pretrial schedule, which will be contained in a written order to be issued today. 6) The Court scheduled argument on Rodriguez-specific Daubert and summary judgment motions for November 13, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (866) 342-8591 and Conference ID: Zofran for the Status Conference set for October 15, 2019 at 11:00 AM. REMINDER: Counsel who wish to address the court by telephone must notify the courtroom deputy by email prior to the conference. Counsel who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 9/18/2019.1)The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2)The Court heard updates on Phase 5 discovery. 3)The Court heard argument on 1647 PSCs Motion to Strike Evidence from GSKs Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Preemption and took the matter under advisement.4)The Court scheduled a final pretrial conference in Rodriguez v. GSK, Case No. 1:15-cv-13762, for January 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. 5)The Court set pretrial disclosure deadlines in Rodriguez as follows: exhibit lists, witness lists, proposed jury instructions, and proposed voir dire questions to be filed by December 14, 2019; motions in limine to be filed by December 7, 2019, with oppositions due by December 16, 2019.6)The Court set a deadline of October 25, 2019 for plaintiffs oppositions to GSKs summary judgment motions in Rodriguez.7)The Court scheduled the October status conference for 10/15/2019 at 11:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (877) 876-9173 and Conference ID: Zofran for the Status Conference set for September 18, 2019 at 1:30 PM. REMINDER: Counsel who wish to address the court by telephone must notify the courtroom deputy by email prior to the conference. Counsel who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laura Driessen, Michael Driessen. GlaxoSmithKline LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Millrood, Tobias)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GlaxoSmithKline LLC, filed by Laura Driessen, Michael Driessen.(Millrood, Tobias)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Deiessen, et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Finn, Mary)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GlaxoSmithKline LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7839796 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Laura Driessen, Michael Driessen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Category Form)(Millrood, Tobias)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driessen et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Driessen
Represented By: Tobias Millrood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Driessen
Represented By: Tobias Millrood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?