Williams v. Turco et al
Plaintiff: Da'Shawn Williams
Defendant: Mark Fogeran, Karen Collins, John Doe, Chelsea Pilings, Thomas A. Turco, Victor Correira, Emily Holmes, John Schofield, Carol A. Mici, Jeffrey Souza, Dimitrios Mantalos, Massachusetts Department of Corrections, Tyson Gonzalez, Suzanne Thibault and Lisa Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2019cv11807
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion to Compel insofar as the Court will mail the requested documents to plaintiff. (Putnam, Harold)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel by Da'Shawn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Putnam, Harold)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Karen Collins, Victor Correira, Mark Fogeran, Tyson Gonzalez, Emily Holmes, Dimitrios Mantalos, Massachusetts Department of Corrections, Carol A. Mici, Lisa Mitchell, Chelsea Pilings, John Schofield, Jeffrey Souza, Suzanne Thibault, Thomas A. Turco. Summonses mailed to plaintiff with copy of L.R. 4.1, Notice for service by US Marshal, 14 USM-285 forms, consent package and courtesy copy of complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Attachments: #1 consent package, #2 notice to plaintiff and LR 4.1)(PSSA, 4)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at OCCC (PSSA, 4)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 1.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), the Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $5.87. The remainder of the $350 fee, $344.13, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The Clerk shall provide a copy of this Order to the treasurer at the Old Colony Correctional Center. 2.The Clerk shall issue summonses for service of the named defendants and the plaintiff shall serve the summons, complaint, consent package, and this Order in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 3.At this time, a summons will not issue as to the defendant identified as John Doe, Correctional Officer at the Massachusetts Treatment Center. If, through discovery, the plaintiff discovers the true name of the John Doe defendant, he should act promptly to amend the complaint to substitute the correct parties and to dismiss any baseless claims. Id. at 8 n.5. He may then also file a motion for issuance of a summons for this defendant. If a summons issues, the United States Marshal shall complete service as directed by plaintiff with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. 4.Because the plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, he may elect to have the United States Marshals Service (USMS) complete service with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. If so asked by the plaintiff, the USMS shall serve copies of the summons, complaint, the consent package, and this Order upon the named defendants as directed by plaintiff. The plaintiff is responsible for providing the USMS all copies for service and for completing a USM-285 form for each party to be served. The Clerk shall provide the plaintiff with forms and instructions for service by the USMS. 5.The plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of the issuance of the summons to complete service.(PSSA, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Da'Shawn Williams ONLY. (Putnam, Harold)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Da'Shawn Williams.(Castilla, Francis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Supplement Inmate Statement) (Castilla, Francis).
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Da'Shawn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Appendix EXHIBIT LIST, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-20, #4 Exhibit 21-31, #5 Exhibit 31-40, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Turco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fogeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Pilings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Correira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Schofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol A. Mici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitrios Mantalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Thibault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Da'Shawn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?