Feng v. Carbonite, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Feng
Defendant: Carbonite, Inc., Anthony Folger and Mohamad S. Ali
Petitioner: Peoria Police Pension Fund
Case Number: 1:2019cv11808
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Peoria Police Pension Fund re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff (Stern, Leslie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Peoria Police Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Stern, Leslie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Peoria Police Pension Fund. (Stern, Leslie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Peoria Police Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Leslie)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 11/20/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7846127 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by William Feng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Daryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feng v. Carbonite, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbonite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamad S. Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Feng
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peoria Police Pension Fund
Represented By: Leslie R. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?