Wreck It Demolition, Inc. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Wreck It Demolition, Inc.
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Parkway C&A, L.P.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11811
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 Opposition re #9 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration, or Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay filed by Wreck It Demolition, Inc.. (Murphy, Jessica)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Intervene filed by Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.. (Wilson, Dallin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #16 Floor and Decor Outlets of America, Inc.'s Assented to Request for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Intervene. Reply brief shall not be redundant of the brief in support of the motion to intervene and address only matters raised in plaintiff's opposition which were not reasonably foreseeable when the initial brief in support of the motion to intervene was filed. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Intervene by Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Wilson, Dallin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's Assented to Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration or Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay until September 20, 2019. (Beatty, Barbara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Septmeber 20, 2019 to File Opposition to Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration or Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay (Assebted-To) by Wreck It Demolition, Inc..(Murphy, Jessica)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 Opposition re #6 MOTION to Intervene filed by Wreck It Demolition, Inc.. (Murphy, Jessica)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Parkway C&A, L.P., filed by Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit General Contract)(Wilson, Dallin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Wilson, Dallin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Wilson, Dallin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration, or Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Wilson, Dallin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik W. Weibust on behalf of Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc. (Weibust, Erik)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Intervene filed by Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bryan Dodge, #2 Exhibit Parkway v. Floor & Decor Complaint, #3 Exhibit Stipulation of the Parties and Order of the Court)(Wilson, Dallin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene by Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration, #2 Exhibit Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wilson, Dallin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik W. Weibust on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Weibust, Erik)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding, Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.. (Wilson, Dallin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7846490 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet and category sheet)(Wilson, Dallin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wreck It Demolition, Inc. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Dallin R. Wilson
Represented By: Erik W. Weibust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wreck It Demolition, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica E. Murphy
Represented By: Robert B. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Parkway C&A, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.
Represented By: Erik W. Weibust
Represented By: Dallin R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?