Howarth v. Mitchell Construction Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Defendant: Mitchell Construction Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11815
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Morgan Howarth. Mitchell Construction Group, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Morgan Howarth. (Bouchard, Tammy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Morgan Howarth. (Bouchard, Tammy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against Morgan Howarth Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7846938 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 MA Category Form, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bouchard, Tammy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howarth v. Mitchell Construction Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Construction Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Represented By: Tammy Fern Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?