Tarter v. USAA Savings Bank
Plaintiff: Helen Tarter
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv11821
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement by Helen Tarter (Lemberg, Sergei)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time (MacDonald, Gail)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/4/2019 to Respond by Helen Tarter.(Lemberg, Sergei)
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 09/23/2019 is canceled pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion to Continue (MacDonald, Gail)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference and Pre-Conference Filing Obligations by USAA Savings Bank.(Polansky, Kevin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant USAA Savings Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, to Compel Arbitration, and to Strike Plaintiff's Class Claims . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Credit Card Application, #2 Exhibit USAA Credit Card Agreement & Arbitration Addendum)(Polansky, Kevin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/18/2019) (MacDonald, Gail).
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant USAA Savings Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, to Compel Arbitration, and to Strike Plaintiff's Class Claims filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Polansky, Kevin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant USAA Savings Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, to Compel Arbitration, and to Strike Plaintiff's Class Claims by USAA Savings Bank.(Polansky, Kevin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 13, 2019 to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint filed by USAA Savings Bank. USAA Savings Bank answer/response due 9/13/2019.(MacDonald, Gail)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 13, 2019 to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint by USAA Savings Bank.(Polansky, Kevin)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Polansky, Kevin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Set/Reset Deadlines: USAA Savings Bank Answer/Response to Complaint due 9/9/2019. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time (MacDonald, Gail)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 9, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading by USAA Savings Bank.(Polansky, Kevin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Kingston on behalf of USAA Savings Bank (Kingston, Christine)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USAA Savings Bank. (Polansky, Kevin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Savings Bank ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7847431 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A/Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B/Docket from Action, #3 Exhibit C/Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category)(Polansky, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarter v. USAA Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Tarter
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Represented By: Christine Kingston
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?