Meadows v. Tufts University et al
Plaintiff: Kristy Meadows
Defendant: Joyce Knoll, Elizabeth Byrnes and Tufts University
Not Classified By Court: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Case Number: 1:2019cv11825
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket entry 28 was entered in error as to this case and has since been removed. (York, Steve)
January 28, 2020 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for November 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for November 10, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve)
January 27, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Elizabeth Byrnes. (Singal, Bruce)
January 27, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Joyce Knoll. (Singal, Bruce)
January 27, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Jennifer C. Boal appointed.(Belpedio, Lisa)
January 24, 2020 Filing 23 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation: November/December, 2020.(Lima, Christine)
January 23, 2020 Filing 22 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Scheduling Conference held on 1/23/202: Automatic Discovery to be completed by 2/6/20; Amendments and/or Supplements to the Pleadings due by 3/31/2020; written discovery to be served by 7/31/20, answered by 8/31/20; all fact Discovery to be completed by 10/31/2020; experts designated and Rule 26 Reports exchanged by 11/30/20; expert depositions to be completed by 1/15/21; dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2021, oppositions by 2/28/21, replies (only with leave of Court) by 3/15/21. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Case to be referred to Mediation program: November/December, 2020. (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Russcol, Stroup, Singal, McEvoy) (Lima, Christine)
January 17, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendants Tufts University, Elizabeth Byrnes, and Joyce Knoll. (Singal, Bruce)
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Kristy Meadows.(Stroup, Rachel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Kristy Meadows.(Stroup, Rachel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. McEvoy on behalf of Elizabeth Byrnes, Joyce Knoll, Tufts University (McEvoy, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. NOTE - CHANGE IS AS TO TIME ONLY. (Lima, Christine)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #15 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to January 23, 2020 by Kristy Meadows.(Stroup, Rachel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Elizabeth Byrnes, Joyce Knoll, Tufts University.(Singal, Bruce)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Elizabeth Byrnes, Joyce Knoll, Tufts University.(Singal, Bruce)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion for Extension of Time. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Elizabeth Byrnes, Joyce Knoll, Tufts University.(Singal, Bruce)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristy Meadows. All Defendants. (Stroup, Rachel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A. Singal on behalf of Elizabeth Byrnes, Joyce Knoll, Tufts University (Singal, Bruce)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Byrnes, Joyce Knoll, Tufts University. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Russcol on behalf of Kristy Meadows (Russcol, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7847580 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kristy Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Stroup, Rachel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/26/2019) (McDonagh, Christina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows v. Tufts University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Meadows
Represented By: Rachel Stroup
Represented By: David A. Russcol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Knoll
Represented By: Bruce A. Singal
Represented By: Elizabeth J. McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Byrnes
Represented By: Bruce A. Singal
Represented By: Elizabeth J. McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tufts University
Represented By: Bruce A. Singal
Represented By: Elizabeth J. McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?