Martha's Vineyard Airport Commission v. QBE Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Martha's Vineyard Airport Commission
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv11826
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by QBE Insurance Corporation.(Cohen, Mark)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Conference is SCHEDULED for 11/7/2019 at 2:40 p.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against QBE Insurance Corporation, filed by Martha's Vineyard Airport Commission.(Schreckinger, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. (Maselek, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QBE Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group Limited, Corporate Parent QBE Reinsurance Corporation, Corporate Parent QBE Holdings, Inc. for QBE Insurance Corporation.. (Maselek, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Maselek, Jr on behalf of QBE Insurance Corporation (Maselek, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by QBE Insurance Corporation.(Cohen, Mark)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QBE Insurance Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7848859 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Cohen, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martha's Vineyard Airport Commission v. QBE Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha's Vineyard Airport Commission
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Mark E. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?