The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Chen et al
Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Kellerman J. Zheng
Defendant: Jian Feng Zheng and Lu Di Chen
Case Number: 1:2019cv11843
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Dkt. No. 13-1 was removed and refiled, it was corrected because: Memorandum of Law must be filed as a separate document. Counsel is reminded to review local rules and the attorney handbook when filing documents with the Court. (Lara, Miguel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Lu Di Chen, Jian Feng Zheng, and Kellerman J. Zheng filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Lara, Miguel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Lu Di Chen, Jian Feng Zheng, and Kellerman J. Zheng by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Kristen N. Shoaf, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Default Judgment)(Pomeroy, Scott) Modified on 10/25/2019, refer to Notice of Correction entered on 10/25/19. (Lara, Miguel).
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: STANDING ORDER entered on motions for default judgment re #10 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default, #11 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default, #9 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default. (Lara, Miguel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lu Di Chen. (Lara, Miguel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jian Feng Zheng. (Lara, Miguel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kellerman J. Zheng. (Lara, Miguel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Entry of Default. (Lara, Miguel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Pomeroy, Scott)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kellerman J. Zheng served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Pomeroy, Scott)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jian Feng Zheng served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Pomeroy, Scott)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lu Di Chen served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Pomeroy, Scott)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (adminn, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kellerman J. Zheng, Jian Feng Zheng, Lu Di Chen Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7854823 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Insurance, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Decker, Byrne) Modified on 8/30/2019 restricted due to personal identifiers (Warnock, Douglas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Chen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Represented By: Scott K. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellerman J. Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Feng Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lu Di Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?