Feurtado v. Dann Ocean Towing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rupert A. Feurtado
Defendant: Dann Ocean Towing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11875
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rupert A. Feurtado. Dann Ocean Towing, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Latti, Carolyn)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Service of Process filed by Rupert A. Feurtado. Individual(s)/Entities served: Dann Ocean Towing, Inc. (York, Steve)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dann Ocean Towing, Inc. served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Latti, Carolyn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dann Ocean Towing, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dann Ocean Towing, Inc. (Fee Status: Seaman), filed by Rupert A. Feurtado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Seaman's Declaration, #2 Exhibit Civil Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Latti, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feurtado v. Dann Ocean Towing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rupert A. Feurtado
Represented By: Carolyn M. Latti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dann Ocean Towing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?