Scottsdale Insurance Company v. MRH Indian Enterprises LLC
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: MRH Indian Enterprises LLC and Ron High, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11878
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (McElroy, Wm.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Ron High, Jr, MRH Indian Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet)(Sacchitella, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Ron High, Jr, MRH Indian Enterprises LLC.(Sacchitella, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Sacchitella on behalf of Ron High, Jr, MRH Indian Enterprises LLC (Sacchitella, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ron High, Jr served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (McElroy, Wm.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed MRH Indian Enterprises LLC served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (McElroy, Wm.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ron High, Jr, MRH Indian Enterprises LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (McElroy, Wm.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7861055 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form 1-2019)(McElroy, Wm.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. MRH Indian Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRH Indian Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Sacchitella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron High, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Sacchitella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Wm. Gerald McElroy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?