JLB LLC v. Christian R. Egger
Plaintiff: JLB LLC
Defendant: Christian R. Egger
Case Number: 1:2019cv11890
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 11/15/2019 (McDonagh, Christina)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service by JLB LLC.(Stetson, Robert)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Christian R. Egger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Keane, Brian)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief filed by JLB LLC, #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief to Approve Stipulation and Order Regarding Prejudgment Security and Stay of Arrest and Attachment Proceedings filed by JLB LLC (Folan, Karen)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief, #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief to Approve Stipulation and Order Regarding Prejudgment Security and Stay of Arrest and Attachment Proceedings ([Proposed] Order) filed by JLB LLC. (Stetson, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2019 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief filed by JLB LLC, #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief to Approve Stipulation and Order Regarding Prejudgment Security and Stay of Arrest and Attachment Proceedings filed by JLB LLC. Plaintiff will submit new proposed order for the court to sign. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Stetson, Keane, Schlissel) (Folan, Karen)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Keane on behalf of Christian R. Egger (Keane, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by JLB LLC. Christian R. Egger served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Acknowledgement filed by JLB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Stetson, Robert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Christian R. Egger. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Folan, Karen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief to Approve Stipulation and Order Regarding Prejudgment Security and Stay of Arrest and Attachment Proceedings, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief : Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion to Issue a Short Order of Notice. Defendant shall file any paperwork 24 hours in advance of hearing. (Folan, Karen)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief to Approve Stipulation and Order Regarding Prejudgment Security and Stay of Arrest and Attachment Proceedings filed by JLB LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Stetson, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief to Approve Stipulation and Order Regarding Prejudgment Security and Stay of Arrest and Attachment Proceedings by JLB LLC.(Stetson, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Issue a Short Order of Notice by JLB LLC.(Stetson, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief filed by JLB LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Stetson, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief by JLB LLC.(Stetson, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JLB LLC. (Stetson, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) for Declaratory Judgment, Damages, and Equitable Relief against JLB LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7863323 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by JLB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Stetson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JLB LLC v. Christian R. Egger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian R. Egger
Represented By: Brian Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLB LLC
Represented By: Robert W. Stetson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?