NRO Boston, LLC et al v. Kabbage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NRO Boston, LLC and Alice Indelicato
Defendant: Kabbage, Inc. and Celtic Bank Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv11901
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Referring Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 25 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 MOTION to Seal the Unredacted Memorandum of Celtic Bank Corporation and Kabbage, Inc. in Opposition to NRO's Petition to Vacate an Arbitration Award and Exhibits 1-7 and 9-12 Thereto (Halley, Taylor)
October 21, 2019 Filing 24 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion to Seal; granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Halley, Taylor)
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Celtic Bank Corporation, Kabbage, Inc..(Maya, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Seal the Unredacted Memorandum of Celtic Bank Corporation and Kabbage, Inc. in Opposition to NRO's Petition to Vacate an Arbitration Award and Exhibits 1-7 and 9-12 Thereto by Celtic Bank Corporation, Kabbage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Confidentiality Order, #2 Attachment 2-Protective Order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Petersen, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Jon Hoffmann)(Maya, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Celtic Bank Corporation, Kabbage, Inc. in Opposition re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Maya, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Seal filed by Celtic Bank Corporation, Kabbage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Confidentiality Order, #2 Attachment 2-Protective Order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Petersen, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Jon Hoffmann)(Maya, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Celtic Bank Corporation.(Maya, Michael)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M. Maya on behalf of Celtic Bank Corporation (Maya, Michael)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NRO Boston, LLC. Kabbage, Inc. waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Heskin, Shane)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NRO Boston, LLC. Celtic Bank Corporation waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Heskin, Shane)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Supporting Memorandum of Law by NRO Boston, LLC.(Heskin, Shane)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal by NRO Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Heskin, Shane)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, Petition To Vacate An Arbitration Award by NRO Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25, #2 Exhibit 802, #3 Exhibit 803)(Heskin, Shane)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 817 to Petition to Vacate an Arbitration Award by NRO Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 818)(Heskin, Shane)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Complaint, of James Williams in Support of Petitioners Motion to Vacate the Arbitration Award. (Heskin, Shane)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Vacate an Arbitration Award against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7866655 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by NRO Boston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Heskin, Shane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NRO Boston, LLC et al v. Kabbage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRO Boston, LLC
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Indelicato
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabbage, Inc.
Represented By: Michael M. Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Bank Corporation
Represented By: Michael M. Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?