Blen-Alme v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Natacha Blen-Alme
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv11906
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Gail Roma on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Roma, Jennifer)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 MDL Records received from the District of Arizona, Case number: 17-719.. (Attachments: #1 lead docket sheet, #2 notice of filing submissions, #3 case management orders part 1, #4 case management orders part 2, #5 discovery orders, #6 discovery and privilege orders, #7 daubert orders, #8 motion in limine orders, #9 deposition designation orders, #10 miscellaneous orders, #11 master and short form pleadings)(Jones, Sherry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Case remanded from the District of Arizona; Case Number 17-00719. (Jones, Sherry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-00719.
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the District of Massachusetts via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #7 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 9, 2017 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183039 as to Adam J Combies. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 9, 2017 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183040 as to Christopher M Pasquale. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 9, 2017 Filing 5 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-719-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 9, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Adam J Combies on behalf of Natacha Blen-Alme. (MAP)
March 9, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christopher M Pasquale on behalf of Natacha Blen-Alme. (MAP)
March 9, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Natacha Blen-Alme. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 9, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX183038 filed by Natacha Blen-Alme.(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blen-Alme v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Roma
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Roma
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natacha Blen-Alme
Represented By: Adam J. Combies
Represented By: Christopher M. Pasquale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?