McGillen v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N A et al
Plaintiff: John and Amy McGillen
Defendant: Jamie Welch, JPMorgan Chase Bank N A, MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P. and Orlans PC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11917
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION waiver of service of process by John and Amy McGillen.(Wasser, Brian)
October 28, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed 7/6/00, #2 Exhibit B - Deed 9/25/00, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment 3/6/09, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment 8/24/17)(Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P..(Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 26 Opposition re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief and to Shorten Opposition Period filed by John and Amy McGillen. (Wasser, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Ankrom on behalf of MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. If Plaintiff opposes Defendants request to provide further briefing to the Court in the form of a reply, the opposition is due by cob October 26, 2019. Any such opposition, limited to four pages, shall state the basis for the opposition. re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief and to Shorten Opposition Period filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A ( Replies due by 10/26/2019.)(Simeone, Maria)
October 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief and to Shorten Opposition Period by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: E-mail Chain with Plaintiffs' Counsel Brian Wasser, Esq.)(Kennedy, J.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 22 Amended MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint w/ Corrected Caption filed by John and Amy McGillen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Overlook Properties LLC, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - BNYM v. DUNDON 2019-J-0257)(Wasser, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by John and Amy McGillen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Overlook Properties LLC, #2 Ex 2 BNYM v. DUNDON 2019-J-0257)(Wasser, Brian)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by John and Amy McGillen.(Wasser, Brian)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John and Amy McGillen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BNYM v. DUNDON 2019-J-0257, #2 Exhibit Lozzi Decision, #3 Exhibit Smith v Chase)(Wasser, Brian)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Responses due by 10/17/2019 (Simeone, Maria)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 17, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by John and Amy McGillen.(Wasser, Brian)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10-20280 Bankruptcy Petition Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Adversary Complaint in Docket 13-01435, #3 Exhibit C - AP 13-01435 Docket)(Kennedy, J.) Modified on 9/26/2019 to seal Exhibit B( it contains personal identifier information: DOB, account 3, loan #) (Montes, Mariliz).
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A.(Kennedy, J.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/ Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant, MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P. answer/ response due 10/28/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P..(Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Orlans PC, Jamie Welch.(Gikas, Effie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kennedy, J.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Remove (Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.. (Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Bizar on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N A (Bizar, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse on behalf of MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P. (Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Farside, Jr on behalf of MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P. (Farside, Joseph)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co for JPMorgan Chase Bank N A.. (Kennedy, J.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7868331 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket/Filings, #2 Exhibit Email Consents, #3 Exhibit Mass. SOS -- Orlans, PC, #4 Exhibit Zillow Info for Property, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form)(Kennedy, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGillen v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N A et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Welch
Represented By: Effie L. Gikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N A
Represented By: J. Patrick Kennedy
Represented By: David M. Bizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlans PC
Represented By: Effie L. Gikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John and Amy McGillen
Represented By: Brian J. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?