Moses v. Spaulding
Petitioner: Richard Moses
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Case Number: 1:2019cv11922
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the District of Vermont and assigned civil case number 2:19-cv-00189. (Danieli, Chris)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 Copy re 11 Order, 12 Case Transfer to District of Vermont, mailed to Richard Moses on 10/24/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred to the District of Vermont. Case file electronically sent to Clerk in that district. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Richard Moses. This case having been filed in the inappropriate venue, and the fee having been paid, the case is hereby transferred to the Sentencing Court - the federal court in the District of Vermont. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Response by Stephen Spaulding to #9 Declaration . (Kanwit, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION by Richard Moses. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY by Richard Moses re #7 Response to #1 2255 Motion. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (2255) by Stephen Spaulding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kanwit, Thomas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Stephen Spaulding (Kanwit, Thomas)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST076523 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) #4 Order, (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Richard G. Stearns: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. if petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. (Attachments: #1 IFP application form)(PSSA, 4)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Richard Moses. (Castilla, Francis)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Richard Moses.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?