UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT
Claimant: Mohammed Salah
Case Number: 1:2019cv11924
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: 45 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND CLOSING ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE: The Parties have reported that this case has settled. A 45 day settlement order of dismissal will enter and this case will be closed. (Simeone, Maria)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On 10/17/2019, the Court granted permission in open court for Claimant, Mohammed Salah to file electronically via ECF on the condition that the Claimant satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. The Claimant is directed to complete the registration form accessible at https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/ecfreg.html.(Montes, Mariliz)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 WARRANT AND MONITION issued (Montes, Mariliz)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/8/2019 (Simeone, Maria)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Hearing held on 10/17/2019. Counsel state the status of the case. The claimant appears by telephone. The court holds an ex parte hearing with the claimant and counsel. Claimant does not object to the withdrawal of Attorney Nathan and requests time to determine whether he intends to seek new counsel. The court will allow the motion to withdraw of Atty Nathan, cancel the status report deadline set for 10/18/19 and allow the claimant time to determine how to proceed. The Court allows the Claimant to file electronically, as he is from out of state. The claimant shall file a status report by 11/8/19 as to how he intends to proceed and 7 days after the answer is filed, the government shall file a status report proposing a schedule to govern the case. The court will issue the warrant and monition. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion to Continue to file status report by 10/18/19. (Simeone, Maria)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Claimant's Assented-To Motion to Enlarge Time for Filing Status Report to October 18 by $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT.(Nathan, Geoffrey) Modified on 10/9/2019 (Montes, Mariliz).
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Attorney Nathan filed a notice of claim in this forfeiture proceeding regarding $36,000 on 9/20/19 on behalf of Fadal la. Thereafter, on 10/1/19 Attorney Nathan filed a notice of claim on behalf of Mohamed Fadal Salah contending that Salah was entitled to the $36,000 seized. On 10/5/19, Attorney Nathan, based on a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship, filed a notice of withdrawal. The Court will hold a hearing regarding the sequence of these filings and claimant's view of Attorney Nathan's withdrawal on 10/17/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Attorney Nathan shall appear in person. In addition, he shall notify the claimant. The claimant shall also appear in person. Failure of the claimant to appear in person may result in dismissal with prejudice of the claim. re #7 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT (Montes, Mariliz)
October 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Geoffrey G. Nathan (Nathan, Geoffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol E. Head on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Head, Carol)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Counsel are to file a joint status report by October 11, 2019 proposing their joint or separate positions as to how this matter should proceed. re #4 Claim filed by $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT, ( Status Report due by 10/11/2019)(Simeone, Maria)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 CLAIM by $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT. (Nathan, Geoffrey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey G. Nathan on behalf of $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT (Nathan, Geoffrey)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Affidavit Agent Affidavit, #4 Proposed Warrant and Monition)(Lazarus, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $36,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED AT LOGAN AIRPORT
Represented By: Geoffrey G. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: David G. Lazarus
Represented By: Carol E. Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mohammed Salah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?