Tarasuik et al v. Greenville Real Estate Group, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joan Bernard and Ryan Tarasuik
Defendant: Jay Zaheer, Greenville Real Estate Group, Inc and Daniel R Ryan, Sr
Case Number: 1:2019cv11927
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiffs have filed a "First Amended Complaint with Motion" #6 in which they ask that the Court vacate its order dismissing the action without prejudice. The Court finds no basis to do so. The Court dismissed the action without prejudice so as not to interfere with the plaintiffs' pending state court matter before the Supreme Judicial Court. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #7 shall be terminated as moot. Defendants' request for attorneys fees #8 is denied. (PSSA, 3)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Satterwhite on behalf of Greenville Real Estate Group, Inc, Daniel R Ryan, Sr, Jay Zaheer (Satterwhite, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Response to #6 Amended Complaint and Motion to Vacate by Greenville Real Estate Group, Inc, Daniel R Ryan, Sr, Jay Zaheer to #6 Amended Complaint with Certification of Service. (Attachments: #1 Family & Probate Matters, #2 Emails)(Satterwhite, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2019 to correct docket text and to link to Amended Complaint (Pacho, Arnold).
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joan Bernard. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jay Zaheer, Greenville Real Estate Group, Inc, Daniel R Ryan, Sr, filed by Joan Bernard, Ryan Tarasuik. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granted with regard to Tarasuik. Denied without prejudice with regard to Bernard. This action shall be dismissed without prejudice. (PSSA, 3) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/27/2019) (PSSA, 3).
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joan Bernard, Ryan Tarasuik.(Castilla, Francis)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joan Bernard, Ryan Tarasuik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarasuik et al v. Greenville Real Estate Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Zaheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville Real Estate Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel R Ryan, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Tarasuik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?