Martinez v. Lagos
Plaintiff: Claudia Martinez
Defendant: Jesus P Lagos
Case Number: 1:2019cv11931
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jesus P Lagos. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum of Law)(Borgas, Danilo)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Danilo A. Borgas on behalf of Jesus P Lagos (Borgas, Danilo)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: Electronic Order entered: The emergency motion of the Plaintiff, Claudia Martinez, for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #4 is DENIED. The plaintiff has failed to show that she is likely to suffer irreparable harm absent emergency relief as she acknowledges that she has been unable to access the premises of the business since on or after November 1, 2013. Additionally, the plaintiff's claim that there is a substantial risk that without injunctive relief she will see no recovery on a judgment is insufficient. Ross-Simons of Warwick, Inc. v. Baccarat, Inc., 102 F.3d 12, 19 (1st Cir. 1996) ("the plaintiff's showing must possess some substance; a preliminary injunction is not warranted by a tenuous or overly speculative forecast of anticipated harm"). (Halley, Taylor)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Injunctive Relief and Temporary Restraining Order by Claudia Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Cissero, Miryam)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jesus P Lagos. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Claudia Martinez against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7872113 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Claudia Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover and docketsheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits)(Cissero, Miryam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus P Lagos
Represented By: Danilo A. Borgas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Martinez
Represented By: Miryam E. Cissero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?