Capriole v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Capriole
Defendant: Dara Kosrowshahi and Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11941
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. filed by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Theane Evangelis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Heather Richardson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Theane Evangelis Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7959698 by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Heather Richardson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7959630 by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather Richardson)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by John Capriole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. filed by John Capriole. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by John Capriole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #11 Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California., #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Lipshutz, Joshua)
October 4, 2019 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to various dates. Proposed dates adopted: Defendants' deadline to file their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion: Thursday, October 17, 2019. Defendants' deadline to file their Motion to Compel Arbitration: Thursday, October 17, 2019. Plaintiffs' deadline to file his Reply in support of his Preliminary Injunction Motion: Thursday, October 31, 2019. Plaintiffs' deadline to file his Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration: Thursday, October 31, 2019. Defendants' deadline to file their Reply in support of their Motion to Compel Arbitration: Thursday, November 7, 2019. Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration set for 12/4/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to various dates - See proposed dates to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Compel filed by the parties. by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Lipshutz, Joshua)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Lipshutz on behalf of Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adelaide H. Pagano on behalf of John Capriole (Pagano, Adelaide)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Lipshutz on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof by John Capriole.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Case was randomly assigned due to 14cv13938-FDS has been closed for over two (2) years - case closed on 1/26/2019) (Finn, Mary)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7874460 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Dara Kosrowshahi, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form for New Civil Cases)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capriole v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Capriole
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dara Kosrowshahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?